Gender | Male |
---|---|
Weekday | Sunday |
Date | March 1, 1931 |
Time | 6 a.m. |
Daylight Saving | No |
City | Florence, Tuscany, Italy |
Geo-location | 43ºN46'45.3", |
Timezone | Europe/Rome |
City | Florence, Tuscany, Italy |
---|---|
Timezone | Europe/Rome |
Time (Europe/Rome) | Mar. 01, 1931, 06:00:00 AM |
---|---|
Time (UTC) | Mar. 01, 1931, 05:00:00 AM |
Time (LMT) | Mar. 01, 1931, 05:44:59 AM |
Time (Julian) | 2426401.70833333 |
LMT Correction | 0.7497 Hrs |
Ayanmsha | True Chitra - 22º53'5.49" |
Italian bank executive and politician. In June 1995 Lamberto succeeded Berlusconi as the Premier and President of the Council of Ministers. Originally starting in 1959 as an economist of the International Monetary Fund, he worked as a member of the executive committee, elected by Italy, Greece, Portugal and Malta, 1976-1982. From 1979, he also served as the Director General of the Bank of Italy, Board Member of Directors of the Italian Exchange Office, Economic Policy Committee, Monetary Committee and Alternate Governor of Italy. Lamberto has numerous articles on economic and fiscal policies in Italy and foreign periodicals. He received a degree in economics from the University of Florence in 1955, with postgraduate studies with the Universities of Minnesota and Michigan, a Stringher scholarship from the Bank of Italy, a Fullbright scholarship from the U.S. government and a Ford Foundation research fellowship. He is married to Donatella Pasquali Zingone and they have one child.
S.No. | Event Type | Event Date | Event Description |
---|---|---|---|
1 |
New Job |
Jan. 1, 1959 |
Work : New Job 1959 (Economist) |
2 |
New Job |
Jan. 1, 1976 |
Work : New Job 1976 (Executive committee) |
3 |
New Job |
Jan. 1, 1979 |
Work : New Job 1979 (Italian Exchange Office) |
4 |
New Job |
June 1, 1995 |
Work : New Job June 1995 (Premier of Italy) . |
Task Name | Action/Status | |
---|---|---|
|
Astrological Calculations & Analysis
Processed |
|
|
AI-ML Optimized Prediction & Refinement
Processed |
Processed
Processed
Ready
Ready
Ready
Degree Completion
Jan. 1, 1955
Social : End a program of study 1955 (Degree in economics)